THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 22:32:44 PM
Hughes, Rhiannon Mary
CPSO#:
56784
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
29 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Mar 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Hughes-Benzie, Rhiannon Mary (used until: 20 Feb 2017 )
Hughes-Benzie, Rhiannon Mary (used until: 14 Oct 1987 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Rhiannon Mary Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 10 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Pediatrics & Genetics Clinic
Room 102
381 2nd Ave
Campbell River, BC V9W 3V1
Date Received: 29 Jun 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Genetics and Genomics |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Sep 1993
Resident 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Aug 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Jun 2018 |