THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 13:04:07 PM
Herst, Jordan Allan
CPSO#:
56781
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jul 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Northeast Cancer Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 522-6237 Ext. 2320
Fax: (705) 523-7329
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:20 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:20 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JORDAN ALLAN HERST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERST is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Clinical Haematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1987 |