THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 4:45:01 AM
Heggie, Jane Ellen
CPSO#:
56779
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Department Of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3567
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Dec 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JANE ELLEN HEGGIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEGGIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Research Fellows - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1987 |