THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:13:48 PM
Giles, Kathryn Anne
CPSO#:
56762
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Sep 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
201-182 Pinebush Rd
Cambridge ON N1R 8J8
Phone: 226-895-1100
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:25 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATHRYN ANNE GILES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 4 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 1987 |