THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 10:16:09 AM
Brule, Michele Fleurette Mercia
CPSO#:
56734
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON P3E 1B8
Phone: (705) 673-8391
Fax: (705) 673-7330
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Manitoulin Health Centre |
Little Current |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:12 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHELE FLEURETTE MERCIA BRULE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRULE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1989 |