THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:45:52 PM
Borenstein, Harold Bernard
CPSO#:
56729
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Dec 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2100 Finch Avenue West
Suite 106
North York ON M3N 2Z9
Phone: (416) 739-7558
Fax: (416) 739-7601
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:22 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:06 Sep 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HAROLD BERNARD BORENSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORENSTEIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Nephrology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 1987 |