THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 8:57:06 AM
Black, Michael Darryl
CPSO#:
56728
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Florida
USA - Texas
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:11 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:03 Sep 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DARRYL BLACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Cardiovascular Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Cardiothoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1987 |