THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:44:38 AM
Azzie, Georges Ralph
CPSO#:
56719
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jun 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: University of Toronto, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of General Surgery
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 202413
Fax: (416) 813-7477
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Botswana
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:09 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric General Surgery |
Effective:30 Nov 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GEORGES RALPH AZZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZZIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 2000 |