THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 16:01:35 PM
Mazloom, Fereshteh
CPSO#:
56690
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
02 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Farzan Nejad, Fereshteh (used until: 14 Oct 1987 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, Persian, Spanish
Education: University of Barcelona, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Dec 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1988 |