THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:41:17 AM
Keller, Emilia
CPSO#:
56680
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 May 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Dec 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Komenskeho, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: E. Keller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 5 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 May 2013 |
Concerns
Source:
Discipline Committee
Active Date: May 31, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Allegations that Dr. Emilia Keller committed professional misconduct were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College, namely that she (i) failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and (ii) engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. In the face of these allegations, and without the allegations having been adjudicated, Dr. Keller resigned from the College, effective May 1, 2013, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.