THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 20:01:22 PM
Naidoo, Radhakrishnan Prushothma
CPSO#:
56677
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Zimbabwe, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
305-2333 Dundas St W
Toronto ON M6R 3A6
Phone: (416) 534-6379
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RADHAKRISHNAN PRUSHOTHMA NAIDOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAIDOO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1988 |