THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:00:09 AM
Siddiq, Nayeema
CPSO#:
56672
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Dec 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Portuguese
Education: American University of the Caribbean, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Nayeema Siddiq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 19 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Dr. Siddiq using the below information:
305 Rusholme Road
Toronto ON M6H 2Y9
(647) 271-4559
Date Received: 15 Dec 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: November 22, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Siddiq’s family medicine practice. Effective December 31, 2021, Dr. Siddiq has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)