THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 17:25:26 PM
Lee, Shoo Kim
CPSO#:
56665
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Dec 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Univ of Singapore, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Shoo Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Department of Pediatrics,
Mount Sinai Hospital,
600 University Avenue,
Toronto, Ontario M5G 1X5
Date Received: 27 Apr 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:05 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 16 Jan 1989 to 12 Mar 1989
EL - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 May 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Mar 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Jul 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Dec 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 May 2022 |