THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:25:13 AM
Singh, Rajiva Ranjan
CPSO#:
56649
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Level E, Suite 4200
3737 Southern, Boulevard
kettering OH 45429
United States
Phone: (937) 294-1489
Fax: (937) 297-6468
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Ohio
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:15 Sep 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAJIVA RANJAN SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 19 May 1986 to 08 Jun 1986
EL - Urology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Urology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Urology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Urology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 May 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1998 |