THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 13:10:30 PM
Simons, Martin Edward
CPSO#:
56648
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Nov 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Nov 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
399 Bathurst Street
3mc-423
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017
Corporation Name: Dr. Martin E. Simons Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 2 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:12 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Interventional Radiology |
Effective:18 Jan 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTIN EDWARD SIMONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMONS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Apr 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jul 2023 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 2023 |