THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 8:07:30 AM
Awad, Awad Ibrahim
CPSO#:
56639
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Nov 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2
420 North Service Road East
Oakville ON L6H 5R2
Phone: (905) 338-3331
Fax: (905) 338-2923
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:29 May 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AWAD IBRAHIM AWAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AWAD is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 1989 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2014 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 04 Apr 2014 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 04 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 2015 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 04 Apr 2014
Summary:
On April 4, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Awad committed acts of professional misconduct. Dr. Awad admitted and the Committee found that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in respect to his care of thirteen sleep medicine patients; Dr. Awad pleaded no contest to and the Committee found that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional in relation to his billing of OHIP for sleep medicine consultations.
Dr. Awad is a psychiatrist, practising sleep medicine. He is a diplomate of the American Board of Sleep Medicine.
The independent expert retained by the College opined that Dr. Awad failed to maintain the standard of practice with respect to twelve of fifteen patient charts reviewed. Examples of concerns include:
a) He routinely directed nasal Continuous Positive Airway Pressure (CPAP) pressure titration studies after the patients had undergone sleep studies without having seen and evaluated the patients in question.
b) A patient had received immovane (5 mg) prior to CPAP titration study, without a physician assessment or clear physician's order. On the basis of severe obstructive sleep apnea and information provided by the family doctor in the patient's referral form, the patient could be seen to be at risk of hypoventilation and excessive daytime somnolence.
c) In one instance, he signed an Assisted Devices Program (ADP) form for the use of nasal CPAP prior to having seen the patient in consultation.
d) He, through his staff in the use of form letters, influenced patients to return to his clinic for follow-up studies, by indicating that the patient's condition was reportable to the Ministry of Transportation in case of lack of compliance to treatment recommendations.
Such communications were made even in instances when patients were not documented to have excessive daytime somnolence or worrisome driving-related problems. The expert opined that these letters were inappropriate and coercive.
e) He has delegated tasks to non-physician members of his staff inappropriately. A discussion of diagnosis and treatment cannot be made by telephone by unqualified clerical and technical staff.
In response to the concerns identified by the expert, Dr. Awad has changed his practice.
Regarding a complaint by Patient A, the independent expert opined that Dr. Awad failed to maintain the standard of practice as follows:
a) His letter to Patient A's family physician provides evidence that the clinic was predisposed to CPAP therapy before patients had been seen by a sleep physician;
b) His records of care show that he misinformed the referring physician by declaring Patient A to have a condition reportable to the Ministry of Transportation, before the patient had been seen or assessed by a sleep physician.
Regarding the finding of disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct, Dr. Awad's office had billed OHIP for consultations, listing Dr. X as the referring physician in relation to 29 patients. Dr. X indicated that he does not and never has referred patients to Dr. Awad and that he has no record of having seen any of these 29 patients.
The Committee ordered and directed that:
the Registrar suspend Dr. Awad's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months, to commence immediately.
the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Awad's certificate of registration:
Practice Assessment
i. Dr. Awad, at his own expense, shall submit to an assessment of his practice by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the date of this order. The assessor shall focus the assessment upon the deficiencies identified in the review of Dr. Awad's practice and shall additionally consider Dr. Awad's performance as Quality Advisor as referenced in the Independent Health Facilities Act, Ontario Regulation 57/92.
ii. Dr. Awad shall abide by all reasonable recommendations of the Assessor.
Dr. Awad appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
Dr. Awad pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460.00, within 30 days of the date of this Order.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 4, 2014