THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 20:50:25 PM
Singh, Artaj
CPSO#:
56630
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jul 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jul 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Primary Care Niagara
660 Garrison Road
Unit 11
Fort Erie ON L2A 6E2
Phone: (905) 371-1881
Fax: (905) 371-1888
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Colorado
USA - Indiana
USA - Kentucky
USA - Ohio
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Feb 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARTAJ SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Mar 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 1988 |