THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:23:16 PM
Perry, Gad Alexander
CPSO#:
56628
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Mar 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Mar 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Radiation Oncology
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-862-9819
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Perry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 7 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GAD ALEXANDER PERRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERRY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Mar 1987 |