THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:31:45 PM
Devi, Bijayalaxmi
CPSO#:
56593
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Dec 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Oriya
Education: Sambalpur University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Baywood Centre
95 Bayly Street West
Suite 308
Ajax ON L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 683-0702
Fax: (905) 683-8381
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:20 Nov 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BIJAYALAXMI DEVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1986 to 30 Jun 1986
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
CF - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 1997 |