THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 9:23:47 AM
Mahler, Ronald Heinrich
CPSO#:
56584
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
27 Feb 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Feb 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: R. Mahler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 8 2017
Medical Records Location
Date Received: 26 Nov 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:18 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Feb 2016 |