THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:36:21 PM
Norris, Phillip Duncan
CPSO#:
56575
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jan 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Oct 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Leicester, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Clinic 528
528 Dundas Street
London ON N6B 1W6
Phone: (519) 645 1533
Fax: (519) 645 1536
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Forensic Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PHILLIP DUNCAN NORRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORRIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 1986 |