THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 15:22:44 PM
Alemayehu, Efrem
CPSO#:
56493
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Amharic, English, Tigrigna
Education: Addis Ababa University, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1670 Dufferin Street
Suite 205
Toronto ON M6H 3M2
Phone: (416) 539-9002
Fax: (416) 539-0309
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EFREM ALEMAYEHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEMAYEHU is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1986 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1986 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Dec 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1990 |