THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 21:55:54 PM
Odulana-Ogundimu, Adebola Oluremi
CPSO#:
56488
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Dec 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: AO Odulana-Ogundimu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Management LTD
13-1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A5
Tel: 1-(800) 775-0093,
Multispecialty Walk-In Clinic
Tel: (905) 897-0788
Date Received: 25 May 2017
Instructions/Address:The medical records for Primary Practice address:
1486 Regent Street South
Sudbury, ON P3E 3Z6
will be stored at Records Management Ltd.
Records Management Ltd
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Fax: (647) 933 2904
Date Received: 05 May 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:07 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |