THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 15:55:40 PM
Nguyen, The Lac
CPSO#:
56484
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Dec 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Vietnamese
Education: University of Saigon, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Lac Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 27 2012
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Fax: 416-398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:27 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 1985 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2012 |