THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 7:24:46 AM
Sudbury, Mary Susan Frances
CPSO#:
56481
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
16 Mar 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Dec 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Brochet, Mary Susan Frances (used until: 22 Feb 1987 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. S. Sudbury Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 18 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:05 Dec 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Mar 2022 |