THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:28:14 PM
Eisenstat, David Daniel
CPSO#:
56452
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Dec 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Sep 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Childrens Hospital
50 Flemington Rd
Children's Cancer Centre
Parkville 3052
Australia
Phone: +61 3 9345 547
Fax: +61 3 9345 448
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Australia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:20 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID DANIEL EISENSTAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EISENSTAT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 20 Jul 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 21 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 4 - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Dec 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 1987 |