THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 16:04:20 PM
Goss, Glenwood Dillon
CPSO#:
56446
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Nov 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jul 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 73955
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:08 Sep 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GLENWOOD DILLON GOSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOSS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 1985 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 1985 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 26 Nov 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 1986 |