THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 20:32:27 PM
O'Doherty, James Joseph Martin
CPSO#:
56444
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Dec 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Aug 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Guelph Family Health Team
Old Quebec Street Mall
Suite 212
55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON N1H 7T8
Phone: 519 837 4444
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J. O'Doherty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 5 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES JOSEPH MARTIN O'DOHERTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'DOHERTY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 1986 |