THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 10:56:33 AM
McKee, Alexander Carman
CPSO#:
56430
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Oct 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2
3635 Rivergate Way
Ottawa ON K1V 2A4
Phone: (613) 739-3459
Fax: (613) 739-1471
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:07 Sep 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER CARMAN MCKEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 09 Sep 1985 to 05 Jan 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Dec 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Jan 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 1986 |