THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:01:59 AM
Morgan, Anwar Victor Kasry
CPSO#:
56399
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Nov 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Oct 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
Obstetrical Anesthesia Division
2075 Bayview Avenue, Rm M5-318
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 4864
Fax: (416) 480-5614
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: March 5, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On March 2, 2018, Women’s College Hospital (WCH) notified the CPSO, pursuant to s.33 of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that on February 23, 2018, Dr. Morgan’s privileges at WCH were suspended pending Dr. Morgan’s completion of all his outstanding patient charts at a standard consistent with WCH’s and CPSO’s policies.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:17 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANWAR VICTOR KASRY MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Oct 1989 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: May 1, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)