THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 10:58:39 AM
Leone, Rosa
CPSO#:
56343
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jun 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Palermo, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Effective May 1st 2023 copies the family practice medical records may be obtain contacting
Dr. Dennis Kim
2698 Jane Street 2nd Floor
North York ON M3L 1S5
Phone: 416-743-2041
Fax: (416) 743-2045
Date Received: 20 Apr 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROSA LEONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1988 |