THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 15:02:04 PM
Shah, Vinod Hemraj
CPSO#:
56337
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 May 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi
Education: University of Manitoba, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Shah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 3 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 1985 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 28 Mar 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 2017 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: March 28, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Vinod Hemraj Shah to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 28, 2017:
The College received information about Dr. Shah’s standard of practice. As a result, Dr. Shah was required to complete a clinical preceptorship and undergo a practice reassessment.
Prior to completing the practice reassessment, Dr. Shah resigned from the College effective May 31, 2017 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.