THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:05:23 PM
Dixon, Peter Frederick
CPSO#:
56336
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Mar 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 May 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 6222
Fax: (905) 721-6101
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site |
Port Perry |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site |
Bowmanville |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Lakeridge Health,Whitby Site |
Whitby |
Northumberland Hills Hospital |
Cobourg |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:13 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER FREDERICK DIXON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIXON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 1985 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 1985 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 15 Sep 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2001 |