THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 13:56:00 PM
Pasquet, Eric Albert
CPSO#:
56300
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Apr 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Eric Pasquet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:5844 Longhearth Way
Manotick, ON K4M 1M1
Date Received: 09 Jul 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:17 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 04 Sep 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Oct 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Apr 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Jul 2018 |