THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 18:32:31 PM
Jaeger, Valerie Anne
CPSO#:
56287
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
19 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Aug 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Michael Petrocci & Valerie Jaeger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Niagara Region Public Health
PO Box 1052, Stn Main
Thorold, ON L2V 0A2
Phone: 905-688-3762
Date Received: 12 Jul 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1984 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Jul 2018 |