THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:02:10 AM
Hall, Trudy Mae
CPSO#:
56284
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
09 Mar 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Aug 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Trudy M. Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 27 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to a copy of their medical record can contact RSRS:
Website: www.GetMyMedicalRecord.ca
Telephone: 1-888-563-3732 Ext: 1 for support.
Date Received: 09 Mar 2021
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc
111 St Regis Crescent South
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: 1 888 563 3732
Fax: 416 398 5932
Date Received: 27 Nov 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1985 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Mar 2021 |