THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:48:23 AM
Kennedy, Louis Joseph
CPSO#:
56266
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Louis Kennedy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 23 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 May 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Jun 2022 |