THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:52:02 AM
Sigalas, John
CPSO#:
56213
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 May 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 May 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: University of Ioannina, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2863 Ellesmere Road
Suite 308
Scarborough ON M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 283-8119
Fax: (416) 283-8168
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:03 Sep 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN SIGALAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIGALAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 May 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 May 1989 |