THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:26:17 AM
Sewchand, Lionel Satyanand
CPSO#:
56205
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2 King Street West
Stoney Creek ON L8G 1G8
Phone: (905) 662-5525
Fax: (905) 662-1855
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LIONEL SATYANAND SEWCHAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEWCHAND is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1985 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 Jul 2001
Summary:
On July 30, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Sewchand(s plea of guilty and found him guilty of professional misconduct with respect to conduct unbecoming a physician. The Discipline Committee ordered the following:
1) A reprimand, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register
2) A three-month suspension, commencing April 30, 2002 which will be suspended if Dr. Sewchand completes a course in Physician Boundaries and Anger Management approved by the College by April 30, 2002.
3) Costs of $2,500.00 to be paid to the College by December 31, 2001.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 30, 2001