THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 0:57:38 AM
Cortens, Michael Alfred
CPSO#:
56198
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Princess Court
35 Van Horne Ave.
Dryden ON P8N 2Z4
Phone: 807-323-3660
Electoral District: 09
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Michael A. Cortens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 20 2020
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1985 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ALFRED CORTENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORTENS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2020 |