THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 16:04:13 PM
Sohn, Adrian Brett Todd
CPSO#:
56175
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 Mar 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Jul 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hausa
Education: McMaster University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Adrian Sohn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 3 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:83 Dawson Rd
Guelph ON N1H 1B1
Date Received: 21 Mar 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1987 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Mar 2018 |