THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:21:21 AM
DeKoven, Joel Glen
CPSO#:
56171
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jan 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
M-1 Dermatology
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4908
Fax: (416) 480-6897
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Community Medicine |
Effective:29 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Dermatology |
Effective:04 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOEL GLEN DEKOVEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEKOVEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 1986 |