THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 11:24:11 AM
Ray, George McConnell
CPSO#:
56146
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 282
Nobel ON P0G 1G0
Electoral District: 08
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. George M. Ray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 4 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Mailing address: P O Box 282, Nobel, ON P0G1G0
Date Received: 02 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 May 2022 |