THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:12:41 AM
O'Brien, Katherine Elizabeth
CPSO#:
56139
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Dec 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department Of Paediatrics
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8336
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:07 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATHERINE ELIZABETH O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1986 |