THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:57:21 AM
Shaw, Bruce Harry
CPSO#:
56117
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
14 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Jan 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: B.H. Shaw Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:27 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1985 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 03 Jan 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2019 |