THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:59:09 AM
Fung Kee Fung, Karen Marie Carew
CPSO#:
56106
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Aug 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Aug 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Ash, Karen Marie Carew (used until: 14 Jul 1998 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department Of Obstetrics And
Gynaecology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8551
Fax: (613) 737-8070
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 May 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Maternal Fetal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAREN MARIE CAREW FUNG KEE FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG KEE FUNG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 1991 |