THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:32:07 AM
Nanaya, Ponnettira Kalappa
CPSO#:
56080
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Apr 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jul 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Karnatak University Dharwar, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Ouellette Campus
Department of Anesthesia
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4421
Fax: (519) 973-4443
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:20 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PONNETTIRA KALAPPA NANAYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NANAYA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Apr 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1990 |