THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 5:18:01 AM
Dore, Marcel Joseph Renato
CPSO#:
56059
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jan 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
08 Dec 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
812 Woolwich St
Guelph ON N1H 6J2
Phone: 226-770-3310
Fax: 1-833-964-0888
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 1989 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 1998 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 08 Dec 1998 |
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 23 Mar 2004 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Discipline Committee |
Effective: 23 Mar 2004 |
|
Active |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Dec 1998
Summary:
In December, 1998, Dr. Dore entered a plea of no contest and the Discipline Committee found Dr. Dore guilty of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Committee ordered the following penalty:
1) Reprimand to be recorded on the Register
2) Terms and conditions on the certificate of registration:
(a) Dr. Dore continue under the care and treatment of his psychiatrist or another psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar, such psychiatrist to provide quarterly reports satisfactory to the Registrar until such time as the Registrar has determined that such reports are no longer required;
(b) Dr. Dore be prohibited from practising psychotherapy until he is able to satisfy the Registrar, based on the reports of two experts acceptable to the Registrar, that this term and condition ought to be removed;
3) A four-month suspension of Dr. Dore(s certificate of registration, such suspension to be suspended if Dr. Dore completes to the satisfaction of the Registrar the following three requirements:
(a) participates and completes the PREP assessment program,
(b) takes and completes the Physician Prescribing Skills Course provided by the College,
(c) takes and completes a course acceptable to the Registrar on physician-patient boundaries;
the suspension is to commence on a date to be determined by the Registrar, not to exceed eight months from the final disposition of this matter.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 07, 1998