THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:05:47 AM
Cusimano, Michael David
CPSO#:
56052
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Toronto, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6048
Fax: (416) 864-5857
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:19 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID CUSIMANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUSIMANO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 1985 |