THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:16:59 AM
Bowen, Julie Lynn
CPSO#:
56039
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Aug 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Aug 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:14 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JULIE LYNN BOWEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOWEN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Apr 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Apr 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1992 |